GA SB281 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act formerly known as the "Bibb County Water and Sewerage Authority Act," now known as the "Macon Water Authority Act," approved March 2, 1966 (Ga. L. 1966, p. 2737), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 23, 1992 (Ga. L. 1992, p. 4991), and by an Act approved April 23, 1999 (Ga. L. 1999, p. 4832), so as to extend the power of the authority to contract with Macon-Bibb County and the Macon-Bibb County Industrial Authority to acquire, construct, and develop industrial sites and facilities; to provide for the use of certain funds of the authority; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Macon Water Authority Act"; power of the authority to contract with Macon-Bibb County and Macon-Bibb County Industrial Authority; extend

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #368 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #213 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02 Effective Date
2017-05-02 Act 78
2017-05-02SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-07SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2017-03-30HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-03-30HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-30HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-28HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-24HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-22SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-03-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-14SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-13SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback