GA SB28 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2022-01-01
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2022-01-01
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 11 of Title 15 and Title 19 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Juvenile Code and domestic relations, so as to strengthen, clarify, and update provisions relating to the protection of children; to require annual training for juvenile court intake officers; to provide for the consideration of evidence, including hearsay evidence, in certain juvenile proceedings; to revise provisions relative to the Juvenile Code and the reporting of child abuse; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Juvenile Code and Domestic Relations; provisions relating to the protection of children; strengthen, clarify and update
Sponsors
Sen. Bo Hatchett [R] | Sen. Brian Strickland [R] | Sen. Clint Dixon [R] | Sen. Chuck Payne [R] |
Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] | Rep. Albert Reeves [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #306 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Passage: House Vote #299 (Y: 123 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #85 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - Passage: House Vote #299 (Y: 123 N: 46 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #85 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective Date 2022-01-01 | |
2021-05-03 | Act 138 | |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2021-03-25 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-25 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Senate Hopper |