GA SB28 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 29 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Senate Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 24 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding insurance generally, so as to prohibit certain insurers from imposing a copayment, coinsurance, or office visit charge in an amount greater than such charges imposed for physician or osteopath services to an insured for services rendered by a physical therapist, occupational therapist, or chiropractor; to provide for a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance; imposing a copayment, coinsurance, or office visit charge in an amount greater than charges imposed for physician; prohibit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-24 - House - House Vote #722 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #585 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-29SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2020-06-24HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2020-06-24HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-06-23HouseHouse Postponed
2020-06-18HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2020-03-13HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-03-12HouseHouse First Readers
2020-03-10SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2020-03-10SenateSenate Third Read
2020-03-09SenateSenate Read Second Time
2020-03-05SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-01-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-01-17SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback