GA SB278 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-28 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-28 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to education, so as to create the Georgia Agricultural and Mechanical University System; to provide for composition of the board and terms of office; to provide for organization and powers; to provide for institutions of the Georgia Agricultural and Mechanical University System; to provide for governance; to provide for powers of condemnation; to provide for athletic associations; to provide conditions for an effective date and automatic repeal; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Agricultural and Mechanical University System; create; composition of the board and terms of office; provide
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate Hopper |