GA SB273 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act revising, superseding, and consolidating the laws relating to the governing authority of DeKalb County and creating a chairman and board of commissioners of said county, approved March 8, 1956 (Ga. L. 1956, p. 3237), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 12, 2015 (Ga. L. 2015, p. 3811), so as to change the jurisdiction and manner of appointment of the Board of Ethics of DeKalb County; to revise definitions; to revise proscribed conduct; to revise conflict of interest provisions; to revise complaint procedures; to increase sanctions for violations; to provide for a referendum; to provide for contingent effective dates; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Board of Ethics of DeKalb County; jurisdiction and manner of appointment; change
Sponsors
Sen. Elena Parent [D] | Sen. Francis Millar [R] | Sen. Emanuel Jones [D] | Sen. Gloria Butler [D] |
Sen. Tonya Anderson [D] | Sen. Steve Henson [D] | Rep. Vernon Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House Vote #349 (Y: 160 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #202 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #202 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub |
2017-03-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-22 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Hopper |