GA SB272 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-15 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary - Non-Civil Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-15 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary - Non-Civil Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 2 of Chapter 13 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to schedules, offenses, and penalties regarding the regulation of controlled substances, so as to prohibit the sale to and by minors of drug products containing dextromethorphan; to provide for definitions; to provide for proper identification; to provide for a list of finished drug products; to provide for penalties; to provide for statutory construction; to provide for state regulation; to provide for limited liability; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Controlled Substances; sale to and by minors of drug products containing dextromethorphan; prohibit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #600 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #617 (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #617 (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Hopper |