GA SB264 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act amending, revising, superseding, and consolidating the laws relating to the governing authority of DeKalb County and creating a chairman and board of commissioners of said county, approved March 8, 1956 (Ga. L. 1956, p. 3237), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 9, 1981 (Ga. L. 1981, p. 4304), so as to authorize establishment by the governing authority of rules regulating certain purchases; to provide for purchases by formal sealed bids; to provide for purchases without formal sealed bids; to provide for related matters; to provide for a referendum; to provide for contingent effective dates and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
DeKalb County; governing authority; rules regulating certain purchases; authorize establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/56215 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/185735 |