GA SB259 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Act 607
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 6 of Title 15 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions regarding the superior courts, so as to move the Superior Court of Banks County from the Piedmont Judicial Circuit to the Mountain Judicial Circuit; to revise the composition and terms of court of the Piedmont Judicial Circuit to the Mountain Judicial Circuit; to provide for the composition and terms of court of the Piedmont Judicial Circuit to the Mountain Judicial Circuit; to provide for related matters; to provide effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Superior Court of Banks County; move from the Piedmont Judicial Circuit to the Mountain Judicial Circuit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-21 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #755 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Motion To Reconsider: Senate Vote #754 (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #753 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-03-21 - House - Passage: House Vote #759 (Y: 150 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #149 (Y: 51 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-06 Act 607
2024-05-06SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2024-04-02SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2024-03-21SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2024-03-21SenateSenate Reconsidered
2024-03-21SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2024-03-21HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2024-03-21HouseHouse Third Readers
2024-03-20HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2023-03-08HouseHouse Second Readers
2023-03-07HouseHouse First Readers
2023-03-06SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2023-03-06SenateSenate Third Read
2023-03-06SenateSenate Taken from Table
2023-03-06SenateSenate Tabled
2023-03-02SenateSenate Read Second Time
2023-03-01SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2023-02-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2023-02-27SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback