GA SB259 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-26 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-26 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 5 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to property tax exemptions and deferral, so as to provide for a homestead exemption from ad valorem taxes for state, county, municipal, or school purposes in an amount equal to the amount by which the current year assessed value of a homestead exceeds the adjusted base year assessed value of such homestead; to provide for definitions; to specify the terms and conditions of the exemption and the procedures relating thereto; to provide for applicability; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Ad Valorem Tax; provide for a homestead exemption from ad valorem taxes for state, county, municipal, or school purposes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Senate Hopper |