GA SB258 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 2 of Title 45 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding eligibility and qualifications for office, so as to provide for ineligibility for office for holders of public money of municipalities who refuse or fail to account and pay over such funds to the proper officer; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eligibility and Qualifications for Office; ineligibility for office for holders of public money of municipalities who refuse; pay over such funds to proper office; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #316 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Vote #319 (Y: 151 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #146 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08 Effective Date
2017-05-08 Act 204
2017-05-08SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-07SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2017-03-30SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2017-03-24HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-24HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-16HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-09HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-06HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-03SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-03-03SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-01SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-27SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-24SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback