GA SB251 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create a board of elections and registration in Fulton County, approved March 30, 1989 (Ga. L. 1989, p. 4577), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 7, 2013 (Ga. L. 2013, p. 4503), so as to remove the authority of the Fulton County legislative delegation in the General Assembly to nominate the person to be appointed chairperson of the board; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Board of Elections and Registration in Fulton County; authority of Fulton County legislative delegation in General Assembly to nominate chairperson; remove
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/56046 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/185162 |