GA SB248 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-20 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 25 of Title 33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to life insurance, so as to provide for life insurers' requirement to review the National Association of Insurance Commissioners life insurance policy locator; to provide for reporting; to provide for Commissioner to prescribe reporting; to provide for enforcement; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Life Insurance; life insurers' requirement to review the National Association of Insurance Commissioners life insurance policy locator; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Marty Harbin [R] | Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. Ellis Black [R] |
Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Sen. Joshua McKoon [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #451 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-20 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-02-15 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Hopper |