GA SB245 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 2 of Article 6 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to competencies and core curriculum in elementary and secondary education, so as to give a short title to a Code section relating to cardiopulmonary resuscitation and use of automated external defibrillators in schools; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
'Cory Joseph Wilson Act'
Sponsors
Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] |
Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] | Sen. Steve Henson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/50892 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/166197 |