GA SB241 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary - Non-Civil Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary - Non-Civil Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 13 of Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to controlled substances, so as to change certain provisions of the electronic data base of prescription information; to transfer responsibilities for the electronic data base of prescription information of the Georgia Drugs and Narcotics Agency to the Department of Public Health; to provide for the department's authority to continue the maintenance and development of the electronic data base of prescription information; to provide for definitions; to change the frequency of reporting provision; to amend Article 1 of Chapter 2A of Title 31 of the O.C.G.A., relating to the Department of Public Health, so as to provide for the department to maintain and administer the electronic data base of prescription information; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Controlled Substances; electronic data base of prescription information; provisions; change
Sponsors
Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] |
Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #136 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-06 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Hopper |