GA SB238 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions, so as to revise provisions relating to the enactment of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated; to clarify the portions of the Code which have the effect of law; to clarify the matter included in the Code that does not have the effect of law; to amend Chapter 9 of Title 28 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Code Revision Commission, so as to clarify the oversight of the commission with respect to state content; to clarify the oversight of the commission with respect to supplementary content; to revise a provision relating to copyright of the Code; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Code Of Georgia; enactment of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated; revise provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #332 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - Passage: House Vote #288 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #166 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - Passage: House Vote #288 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #166 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-10 | Act 306 | |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2021-03-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Hopper |