GA SB237 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-2-86 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to special license plates promoting or supporting certain worthy agencies, funds, or nonprofit corporations with proceeds disbursed to the general fund and the agency, fund, or nonprofit corporation, so as to establish a specialty license plate supporting members of the United States Army Rangers; to provide for related matters; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
License Plates; specialty license plate supporting members of the United States Army Rangers; establish
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Passage: House Vote #353 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #159 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #159 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-05 | Act 222 | |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-31 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-09 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Hopper |