GA SB236 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Effective Date 2021-05-05
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Effective Date 2021-05-05
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to alcoholic beverages, so as to allow food service establishments licensed to sell distilled spirits for consumption on the premises to sell mixed drinks for off-premises consumption in approved containers under certain conditions; to provide for definitions; to provide for the Commissioner of Revenue to promulgate certain rules and regulations; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages; food service establishments to sell mixed drinks for off-premises consumption in approved containers under certain conditions; allow
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #318 (Y: 120 N: 48 NV: 7 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By The Senator From The 28th: Senate Vote #149 (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 28th: Senate Vote #148 (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #150 (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On The Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #127 (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #2 By The Senator From The 28th: Senate Vote #149 (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Adoption Of Amendment #1 By The Senator From The 28th: Senate Vote #148 (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #150 (Y: 36 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On The Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #127 (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Effective Date 2021-05-05 | |
2021-05-05 | Act 227 | |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2021-03-29 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-29 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Senate Hopper |