GA SB236 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to repeal an Act providing that the tax commissioner of Lee County shall retain a percentage of educational funds collected by said officer and remit the same to the governing authority of Lee County to reimburse the county for the cost of collecting school taxes, approved May 30, 2003 (Ga. L. 2003, p. 3937); to provide for related matters; to provide a specific repealer; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Tax Commissioner of Lee County; shall retain a percentage of educational funds; repeal an Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #188 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-18 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Hopper |