GA SB232 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-05 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to enact the "Facilitating Internet Broadband Rural Expansion (FIBRE) Act"; to amend Titles 36, 46, 48, and 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to local government, public utilities and public transportation, revenue and taxation, and state government, respectively, so as to provide for broadband service planning, deployment, and incentives; to provide for the creation and administration of the Georgia Gigabit Ready Community Site designation program by the Department of Economic Development; to change the definitions relative to the "OneGeorgia Authority Act" to include broadband services in the terms "cost of project" and "project"; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Facilitating Internet Broadband Rural Expansion (FIBRE) Act"'; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #539 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-05HouseHouse Second Readers
2018-03-01HouseHouse First Readers
2018-02-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-28SenateSenate Third Read
2018-02-26SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-02-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-22SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-21SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback