GA SB228 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-05 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to motor vehicles, so as to provide for criminal offense and minimum fines for improper operation of an authorized emergency or law enforcement vehicle; to provide for an offense of operating an authorized emergency vehicle with a siren, bell, or whistle in certain instances; to provide for the mandatory license suspension of a driver convicted of a third or subsequent violation of such offense; to provide for fines; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor Vehicles; criminal offense and minimum fines for improper operation of an authorized emergency or law enforcement vehicle; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #570 (Y: 40 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-05 | House | House Second Readers |
2018-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate Hopper |