GA SB226 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 3 of Article 3 of Chapter 12 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to sale or distribution of harmful materials to minors, so as to provide that the provisions of Code Section 16-12-103 shall be applicable to libraries operated by schools; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sale or Distribution of Harmful Materials to Minors; provisions of Code Section 16-12-103 shall be applicable to libraries operated by schools; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-30 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #757 (Y: 29 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - Reconsider: House Vote #780 (Y: 59 N: 91 NV: 15 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2022-03-25 - House - Passage: House Vote #772 (Y: 97 N: 61 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #177 (Y: 35 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-28 Effective Date 2022-07-01
2022-04-28 Act 720
2022-04-28SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2022-04-07SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2022-03-30SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2022-03-25HouseHouse Notice to Reconsider
2022-03-25HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2022-03-25HouseHouse Third Readers
2022-02-10HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-03-31HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2021-03-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-03-10HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-03-09HouseHouse First Readers
2021-03-08SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-08SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-08SenateSenate Taken from Table
2021-03-08SenateSenate Tabled
2021-03-05SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-03-03SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-23SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-02-22SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback