GA SB226 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to alcoholic beverages, so as to change certain provisions relating to the regulation of alcoholic beverages; to change provisions relating to certain annual production requirements for Georgia farm wineries; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic Beverages; regulations; provisions; annual production requirements for Georgia farm wineries; change

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-24 - House - House Vote #310 (Y: 155 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #138 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09 Effective Date
2017-05-09 Act 273
2017-05-09SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-03SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2017-03-24HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-03-24HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-14HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-09HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-06HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-03SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-03SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-01SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-22SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-21SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback