GA SB226 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-20 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 15 of Chapter 1 of Title 10 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to deceptive or unfair practices, so as to provide for the prohibition against the advertising and conducting of certain live musical performances and productions; to provide for a short title; to provide for definitions; to provide for certain civil remedies; to provide for certain penalties; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Truth in Music Advertising Act; prohibition against the advertising/conducting of certain live musical performances

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #175 - Passage (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-20 House Committee Favorably Reported
2009-03-17 House Second Readers
2009-03-12 House First Readers
2009-03-10 Senate Passed/Adopted
2009-03-10 Senate Third Read
2009-03-09 Senate Read Second Time
2009-03-05 Senate Committee Favorably Reported
2009-03-03 Senate Read and Referred

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback