GA SB222 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Veto V9
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Titles 36, 45, and 46 of the O.C.G.A., relating to local government, public officers and employees, and public utilities and public transportation, respectively, so as to create the Local Government 9-1-1 Authority; to provide for members, powers, duties, authority, and responsibilities; to change certain provisions relating to the remittance of 9-1-1 charges; to provide for payment by service suppliers to the Local Government 9-1-1 Authority; to provide for administrative costs; to provide for legal representation; to provide for penalties and interest for noncompliance; to revise definitions relative to the Georgia Emergency Telephone Number 9-1-1 Service Act; to provide for conforming changes; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

'Local Government 9-1-1 Authority Act'; Local Government 9-1-1 Authority; create

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #380 (Y: 143 N: 30 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #361 (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #141 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-09 Veto V9
2017-05-09SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-10SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2017-03-30SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2017-03-30HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-30HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-09HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-06HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-03SenateSenate Passed/Adopted As Amended
2017-03-03SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-01SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-22SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-21SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback