GA SB219 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to alcoholic beverages, so as to provide for regulation of the manufacture, distribution, and sale of malt beverages; to provide a definition; to permit small brewers to sell a limited quantity of malt beverages at retail on the premises for consumption on and off of the premises; to provide for the transfer of a limited quantity of malt beverages by small brewers and brewpubs; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages; regulation of the manufacture, distribution, and sale of malt beverages; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Elena Parent [D] |
Sen. Jason Anavitarte [R] | Sen. Larry Walker [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #143 (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On The Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #127 (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On The Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #127 (Y: 32 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2021-03-25 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2021-03-23 | House | House Postponed |
2021-03-22 | House | House Postponed |
2021-03-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-09 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Senate Hopper |