GA SB217 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Sections 35-8-13.1 and 42-8-107 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to training and certification of municipal probation officers and uniform professional standards and uniform contract standards, so as to revise the authority of a municipal probation officer relative to the exercise of the power of arrest and a Georgia Peace Officer Standards Training Council certification; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipal Probation Officer; exercise of power of arrest and a Georgia Peace Officer Standards Training Council certification; revise the authority

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08SenateSenate Recommitted
2017-02-27SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-24SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-22SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-21SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback