GA SB215 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Veto V11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Veto V11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the Schley County Utilities Authority; to provide for other related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Schley County Utilities Authority; create
Sponsors
Sen. Ed Harbison [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Vote #382 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #215 (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Senate Vote #215 (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Veto V11 | |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2015-04-02 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-04-02 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-04-02 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-31 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-27 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Hopper |