GA SB212 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-15 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state government, so as to provide for pari-mutuel horse racing in this state at a limited number of licensed equestrian centers; to create the Georgia Horse Racing Commission; to provide for the comprehensive regulation of pari-mutuel and related activities; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for definitions; to enter into the Interstate Compact on Licensure of Participants in Live Racing with Pari-mutuel Wagering; to provide a short title; to provide for related matters; to provide for a contingent effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Harry Geisinger Rural Georgia Jobs and Growth Act"; enact
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] | Sen. Ed Harbison [D] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Billy Hickman [R] |
Sen. Michael Rhett [D] | Sen. Frank Ginn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate Hopper |