GA SB209 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 20-14-33 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to indicators of quality of learning in individual schools and school systems, comparison to state standards, and rating schools and school systems, so as to eliminate the star rating for financial efficiency; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Individual Schools and School Systems; star rating for financial efficiency; eliminate

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13SenateSenate Recommitted
2020-01-13SenateSenate Taken from Table
2019-03-07SenateSenate Tabled
2019-03-07SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-05SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-04SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-27SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-27SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback