GA SB208 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 5 of Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to cancellation, suspension, and revocation of licenses, so as to revise the implied consent notices; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Drivers Licenses; implied consent notices; revise
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #130 (Y: 46 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2020-06-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Hopper |