GA SB204 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-17)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 31-17)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 4 of Title 20 of the O.C.G.A., relating to vocational, technical, and adult education, so as to provide for the State Board of the Technical College System of Georgia to award high school diplomas; to provide for a pilot program by the State Board of the Technical College System of Georgia to allow students who are 16 years of age or older, who have completed certain secondary school coursework requirements, and who have withdrawn from secondary school, to enroll in the Dual Achieve Program at a technical college of this state and achieve a high school diploma in conjunction with successful completion of the program; to amend Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the O.C.G.A., relating to elementary and secondary education; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; State Board of the Technical College System of Georgia to award high school diplomas; provide
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute: Senate Vote #398 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - Passage: House Vote #354 (Y: 155 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #111 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #106 (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - Passage: House Vote #354 (Y: 155 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #111 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #106 (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-06 | Act 253 | |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2021-03-31 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-31 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-29 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2021-03-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-05 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate Hopper |