GA SB202 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - Senate Conference Committee Appointed 11th, 45th, 33rd
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 7 of Chapter 4 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to medical assistance generally, so as to provide for an increase in the personal needs allowance to be deducted from a nursing home resident's income; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Assistance; increase in the personal needs allowance to be deducted from a nursing home resident's income; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-21 - House - House Vote #732 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #108 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29SenateSenate Conference Committee Appointed 11th, 45th, 33rd
2018-03-29HouseHouse Insisted
2018-03-29SenateSenate Disagreed House Amend or Sub
2018-03-21HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-21HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-03-15HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-03HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-01HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-02-28SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-27SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-24SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-17SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-16SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback