GA SB200 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Conference Committee Appointed 9th, 135th, 130th
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - House Conference Committee Appointed 9th, 135th, 130th
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 4 of Chapter 2 of Title 32 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to exercise of power to contract by the Georgia Department of Transportation, so as to require the department to develop a procedure for appealing the rejection of a contract bid; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Department of Transportation; procedure for appealing the rejection of a contract bid; require
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Gooch [R] | Sen. Brandon Beach [R] | Sen. Frank Ginn [R] | Sen. Butch Miller [R] |
Sen. Michael Dugan [R] | Sen. P.K. Martin [R] | Rep. Vance Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #370 (Y: 147 N: 19 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #137 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Vote #137 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed 9th, 135th, 130th |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee Appointed 51st, 7th, 25th |
2019-04-02 | House | House Insisted |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Disagreed House Amend or Sub |
2019-04-02 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-04-02 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-04-02 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-29 | House | House Postponed |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-11 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-08 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |