GA SB20 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Effective Date 2024-01-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-4)
Status: Passed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Effective Date 2024-01-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 20E of Title 33 of the O.C.G.A., the "Surprise Billing Consumer Protection Act," so as to ensure consumer access to quality healthcare by setting adequacy standards for network plans offered by an insurer; to provide for conforming changes; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
"Surprise Billing Consumer Protection Act"; ensure consumer access to quality healthcare by setting adequacy standards for network plans offered by an insurer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-27 - House - Passage: House Vote #323 (Y: 166 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #164 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #164 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Effective Date 2024-01-01 | |
2023-05-02 | Act 242 | |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2023-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-23 | House | House Postponed |
2023-03-21 | House | House Postponed |
2023-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-03-07 | House | House First Readers |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Senate Hopper |