GA SB2 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - House Insisted
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 60 of Title 36, Chapter 1 of Title 43, and Title 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions applicable to counties and municipal corporations, general provisions regarding professions and businesses, and state government, respectively, so as to enhance accountability and notice requirements for agency rule making so as to reduce regulatory burdens on businesses; to provide a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"The FAST Act - Fairness, Accountability, Simplification, and Transparency - Empowering Our Small Businesses to Succeed"

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - House - House Vote #678 (Y: 160 N: 5 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #613 (Y: 154 N: 16 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #614 (Y: 66 N: 106 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #615 (Y: 129 N: 33 NV: 12 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - Senate - Senate Vote #63 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-21HouseHouse Insisted
2018-03-14SenateSenate Disagreed House Amend or Sub
2018-03-05HouseHouse Passed/Adopted Reconsidered Bill/Resolution By Substitute
2018-02-28HouseHouse Reconsidered
2018-02-28HouseHouse Third Reading Lost
2018-02-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-15HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-30HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2017-03-28HouseHouse Postponed
2017-03-28HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-22HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-21HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-17SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-02-17SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-16SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-15SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-12SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-01-11SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20172018/SB/2
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/162826.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/165272.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/165789.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/165804.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/169751.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/173942.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/175322.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=14836
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15848
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15847
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15846
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15960

Bill Comments

feedback