GA SB195 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 2-23-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to definitions regarding hemp farming, so as to revise a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Hemp Farming; definition; revise

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - Senate - Adopt Conference Committee Report: Senate Vote #442 (Y: 43 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Motion For The Previous Question: Senate Vote #441 (Y: 43 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - Adopt Ccr: House Vote #433 (Y: 164 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Agree To House Substitute As Amended: Senate Vote #403 (Y: 3 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Adoption Of Amend #2a By Sen From The 46th To Amend #2 By Sen From The 12th: Senate Vote #402 (Y: 8 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-03-25 - House - Passage: House Vote #305 (Y: 165 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #118 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #106 (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03 Effective Date 2021-07-01
2021-05-03 Act 141
2021-05-03SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2021-04-07SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2021-03-31SenateSenate Conference Committee Report Adopted
2021-03-31HouseHouse Conference Committee Report Adopted
2021-03-31HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed 67th, 172nd, 135th
2021-03-31SenateSenate Conference Committee Appointed 1st, 2nd, 28th
2021-03-31HouseHouse Insisted
2021-03-31SenateSenate Disagreed House Amend or Sub
2021-03-25HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-25HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-03-23HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-03-22HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2021-03-17HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2021-03-08HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-03-05HouseHouse First Readers
2021-03-03SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-03SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-03SenateSenate Taken from Table
2021-03-03SenateSenate Tabled
2021-03-01SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-02-26SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-17SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-02-16SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59747
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/197786
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/198911
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/199533
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/201279
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/201494
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/202618
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/202620
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/201842
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/201796
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/202098
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/202257
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/202254
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59747#18326
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59747#18338
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59747#18620
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59747#18904
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59747#18905
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59747#18837
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59747#18943
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59747#18944

Bill Comments

feedback