GA SB195 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 3 of Article 16 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the O.C.G.A., relating to student health in elementary and secondary education, so as to authorize public and private schools to stock a supply of auto-injectable epinephrine; to provide for definitions; to provide for requirements and reporting; to provide for arrangements with manufacturers; to provide for rules and regulations; to provide for limited liability; to amend Chapter 4 of Title 26 of the O.C.G.A., relating to pharmacists and pharmacies, so as to authorize licensed health practitioners to prescribe auto-injectable epinephrine for schools; to authorize pharmacists to fill such prescriptions; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; authorize public/private schools to stock a supply of auto-injectable epinephrine
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate Vote #103 (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-05 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate Hopper |