GA SB193 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 2A of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Positive Alternatives for Pregnancy and Parenting Grant Program, so as to revise the program mission and practice; to remove certain references to medically indigent women; to revise the definition of contract management agency; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Positive Alternatives for Pregnancy and Parenting Grant Program; program mission and practice; revise

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #302 (Y: 44 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Vote #354 (Y: 107 N: 61 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Vote #133 (Y: 36 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Effective Date
2017-05-09 Act 271
2017-05-09SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-07SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2017-03-30SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2017-03-28HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-28HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-09HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-06HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-03SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-03SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-23SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-17SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-16SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback