GA SB193 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 14 of Title 9 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to procedure for persons under sentence of state court of record, so as to update administrative provisions relating to the reimbursement to counties for habeas corpus costs; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Civil Practice; update administrative provisions; reimbursement to counties for habeas corpus costs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #413 - Agree To House Substitute (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House Vote #241 - Passage (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #139 - Passage (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-30 - House - House Vote #241 - Passage (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate Vote #139 - Passage (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Effective Date | |
2011-05-11 | Act 117 | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Date Signed by Governor | |
2011-04-22 | Senate Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Agrees House Amend or Sub | |
2011-03-30 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-30 | House Third Readers | |
2011-03-22 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-21 | House Second Readers | |
2011-03-16 | House First Readers | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2011-03-14 | Senate Third Read | |
2011-03-11 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2011-03-10 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2011-03-03 | Senate Read and Referred |