GA SB192 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 33 of the O.C.G.A., relating to insurance, so as to extensively revise Chapter 41, relating to captive insurance companies; to provide for definitions; to provide for the use of a registered agent to receive service of process; to provide for sponsored captive insurance companies; to provide for letters of credit; to provide for filings and notifications to the Commissioner; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Captive Insurance Companies; definitions; use of a registered agent to receive service of process; letters of credit; provide
Sponsors
Sen. Burt Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/55454 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/182807 |