GA SB190 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 3 of Chapter 27 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to bona fide coin operated amusement machines, so as to provide for certain definitions; to provide for license fees and requirements for manufacturers and distributors; to provide for certain fees upon the transfer of a master license; to provide for an auction of certain licenses; to provide a procedure for dispute resolution; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Bona Fide Coin Operated Machines; provide certain definitions; license fees and requirements for manufacturers and distributors
Sponsors
Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. Nan Orrock [D] | Sen. Michael Dugan [R] |
Sen. William Ligon [R] | Sen. David Shafer [R] | Rep. Robert Dickey [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #360 (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - House Vote #325 (Y: 138 N: 27 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #150 (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - House - House Vote #325 (Y: 138 N: 27 NV: 5 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #150 (Y: 47 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-04-08 | Act 18 | |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2015-03-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-18 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senate Hopper |