GA SB189 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 17 of the O.C.G.A., relating to criminal procedure, so as to change provisions relating to the legal defense of indigents; to change and clarify provisions relating to the authority and responsibilities of the Georgia Public Defender Council and its director; to authorize the creation of more divisions within the council; to clarify the obligation of the council and circuit public defender offices in representing individuals and providing services; to change provisions relating to the circuit public defender supervisory panel; to provide for reporting of certain information; to provide a method for an alternative delivery system to become a circuit public defender office; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure; legal defense of indigents; provisions; change; clarify defined terms

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08SenateSenate Recommitted
2017-02-27SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-24SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-17SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-16SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback