GA SB188 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 3 of Article 16 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to health, so as to require each local board of education to adopt a policy prohibiting school personnel from taking certain actions in regards to a parent or guardian placing, or not placing, a student on psychotropic medication; to provide for a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health; adopt a policy prohibiting school personnel from taking actions; psychotropic medication; require each local board of education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-08SenateSenate Recommitted
2017-03-01SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-16SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-15SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback