GA SB187 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 20-2-2114 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to qualifications for the scholarship program for special needs students, so as to expand eligibility for the program to certain lawful refugees and asylees; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; expand eligibility for the program to certain lawful refugees and asylees
Sponsors
Sen. Charlie Bethel [R] | Sen. Steve Henson [D] | Sen. Joshua McKoon [R] | Sen. Donzella James [D] |
Sen. Curt Thompson [D] | Sen. Hunter Hill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |