GA SB186 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to education, so as to clarify language relating to the effect of dual credit courses on HOPE scholarship and grant applicability; to provide that students who earned a high school diploma through certain dual credit coursework are eligible for a HOPE grant toward an associate degree; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education; HOPE; students who earned high school diploma through dual coursework are eligible; associate degree; clarify

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #301 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Vote #313 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #122 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Effective Date
2017-04-27 Act 35
2017-04-27SenateSenate Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-06SenateSenate Sent to Governor
2017-03-30SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2017-03-24HouseHouse Passed/Adopted As Amended
2017-03-24HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-16HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-06HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-03HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-01SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-01SenateSenate Third Read
2017-02-28SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-02-27SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-16SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-15SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback