GA SB186 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to education, so as to clarify language relating to the effect of dual credit courses on HOPE scholarship and grant applicability; to provide that students who earned a high school diploma through certain dual credit coursework are eligible for a HOPE grant toward an associate degree; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Education; HOPE; students who earned high school diploma through dual coursework are eligible; associate degree; clarify
Sponsors
Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] | Sen. Francis Millar [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] | Sen. Freddie Sims [D] |
Sen. Michael Rhett [D] | Sen. Horacena Tate [D] | Rep. Randy Nix [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #301 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Vote #313 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #122 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Vote #313 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #122 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-04-27 | Act 35 | |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2017-03-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2017-03-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-06 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-03 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Senate Hopper |