GA SB185 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary - Non-Civil Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-19 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Judiciary - Non-Civil Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to health, so as to provide for a program of clinical trials of cannabidiol or cannabidiol-containing products for use in treating certain residents of this state under 18 years of age who have medication-resistant epilepsies; to provide for immunity from criminal prosecution; to provide for related matters; to provide effective dates; to provide for automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Health; program of clinical trials of cannabidiol-containing products; treating certain residents under 18 years of age who have medication-resistant epilepsies
Sponsors
Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] | Sen. Renee Unterman [R] | Sen. Francis Millar [R] | Sen. Bruce Thompson [R] |
Sen. Butch Miller [R] | Sen. Judson Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - Senate - Senate Vote #137 (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-18 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |