GA SB184 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 8 of Title 4 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to dogs, so as to provide that breed-specific regulation shall be limited to enactment by general law; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Dogs; provide breed-specific regulation shall be limited to enactment by general law
Sponsors
Sen. Ellis Black [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] | Sen. Ross Tolleson [R] | Sen. Chuck Hufstetler [R] |
Sen. Bill Heath [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #808 (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Vote #789 (Y: 125 N: 41 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #121 (Y: 42 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - House - House Vote #789 (Y: 125 N: 41 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #121 (Y: 42 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-04-26 | Act 366 | |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Senate Date Signed by Governor |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2016-03-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2016-03-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-03-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-18 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate Hopper |