GA SB183 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 16 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding sheriffs, so as to revise qualification requirements for the office of sheriff; to require certification as a peace officer at the time of qualifying as a candidate for sheriff; to require such candidate to be in good standing with the Georgia Peace Officer Standards and Training Council; to provide for a confirming affidavit; to provide for a definition; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Office of Sheriff; qualification requirements; revise
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Robertson [R] | Sen. Jason Anavitarte [R] | Sen. Chuck Payne [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] |
Sen. Lee Anderson [R] | Rep. J Collins [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - Table: House Vote #853 (Y: 89 N: 52 NV: 3 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - Reconsider: House Vote #852 (Y: 91 N: 48 NV: 4 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - Passage: House Vote #851 (Y: 83 N: 55 NV: 4 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #122 (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #106 (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - Reconsider: House Vote #852 (Y: 91 N: 48 NV: 4 Abs: 36) [PASS]
2022-04-01 - House - Passage: House Vote #851 (Y: 83 N: 55 NV: 4 Abs: 37) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #122 (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Motion To Table All Bills On Rules Calendar: Senate Vote #106 (Y: 33 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2022-04-04 | House | House Taken from Table |
2022-04-01 | House | House Tabled |
2022-04-01 | House | House Reconsidered |
2022-04-01 | House | House Third Reading Lost |
2022-04-01 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-03-05 | House | House First Readers |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Senate Hopper |