GA SB182 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Game, Fish, and Parks Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 4 of Chapter 4 of Title 27 of the O.C.G.A., relating to seafood, so as to provide for mariculture development; to amend Code Section 12-5-295 of the O.C.G.A., relating to applicability of activities in coastal marshlands, so as to revise and add an exemption certain; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Seafood; mariculture development; legislative findings; definitions; unlawful acts; permitting; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Vote #85 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-03-04HouseHouse First Readers
2019-03-01SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-01SenateSenate Third Read
2019-02-28SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-02-27SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-25SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-25SenateSenate Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback